Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Artificial or Natural Flavoring - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Ciliberti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from shipping, importing, or selling into or within the State an electronic smoking device to which a certain artificial or natural flavoring is added; and providing that a person that violates the prohibition on shipping, importing, or selling into or within the State an electronic smoking device to which an artificial or natural flavoring has been added is subject to a certain civil penalty.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Devices - Artificial or Natural Flavoring - Prohibition
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 3:41 PM