Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education - Mathematics - Graduation Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Griffith and Bohanan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to establish high school graduation requirements in mathematics for specified students.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0734
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM