Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Air Ambulance Transport Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide specified health insurance benefits under specified insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for specified air ambulance transport services; requiring specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that use a provider panel to ensure that provider panels include specified providers for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1121
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-112, 15-850 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM