Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory Board
Sponsored by
Delegate James
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory Board; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Board; requiring the Board to make recommendations regarding the establishment of a Maryland Criminal Justice and Behavioral Health State Technical Assistance Center, report its findings and recommendations on or before June 30, 2014, to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly, and provide ongoing support and assistance to the Center; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0956
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM