Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Carr, Frush, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, Morhaim, Patterson, Queen, Reznik, Shoemaker, Stein, A. Washington, K. Young, Brooks, Clippinger, Glenn, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust for private sector employees; establishing the Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board to implement, maintain, and administer the Program and the Trust; requiring the Board to take any action to ensure that the Program is not preempted by federal law, to establish procedures and disclosures to protect the interests of participants and employers, and to disseminate to employers and employees information about the Program prior to enrollment; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1007
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273598/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {433025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {203923/1 Rejected (56-81)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {793025/1 Rejected (51-84)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-45)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {819531/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-41)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {273598/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {433025/1 Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {203923/1 Rejected (56-81) 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {793025/1 Rejected (51-84) 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-45) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 61
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {819531/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (97-41) 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101 through 12-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM