Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott, Cluster, Ready, and Stocksdale
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, in a sentencing or disposition hearing, a juvenile court to allow a victim or the victim's representative to address the court under oath before the imposition of sentence or other disposition under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {842012/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {842012/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 53A
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-401, 11-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM