Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers – Public Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger and Barron
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, if a certain trial board hearing is open to the public, advance notice, an agenda, audio recordings, and the findings of fact shall be provided to the public under certain circumstances; requiring that a certain complainant, on a written request, be provided with certain information after final action is taken by the head of the Law Enforcement Agency if a complaint is filed against a law enforcement officer involved in a death.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {312410/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Officers – Public Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-21)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing by Hearing Board - Public Information
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {312410/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Officers – Public Information
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (117-21) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-107, 3-202, 3-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM