Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Registration of Volunteer Rescue Squads
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, Hettleman, Morhaim, Oaks, and Stein
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Fire Department to register private nonprofit ambulance services as volunteer rescue squads; and requiring that the Fire Department register private ambulance services with an Internal Revenue Code § 501(c)(3) nonprofit status as volunteer rescue squads.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page