Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsored by
Delegates Bhandari, Arikan, Charles, Crosby, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Ivey, Kerr, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Stein, Turner, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Hearing Aid Loan Bank Program in the State Department of Education to be the Hearing Aid and Language and Communication Video Loan Bank Program; requiring the Loan Bank to lend language and communication videos and certain downloadable resources to the parents or legal guardians of deaf or hard of hearing children; exempting the parent or legal guardian of a deaf or hard of hearing child from paying tuition for a course that teaches a language or communication mode at a public institution of higher education; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956386/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {956386/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Text - Chapter - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.10, 8-601 through 8-606 )
(   19-308.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM