Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Northern Snakehead Bowfishing License - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, B. Barnes, Beitzel, Buckel, Cassilly, Chang, Cluster, Fennell, Flanagan, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, C. Howard, Jacobs, Jalisi, Kipke, Krebs, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Malone, Mautz, McCray, McKay, W. Miller, Moon, Morgan, O'Donnell, Otto, Patterson, Platt, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, and B. Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations governing the use of bowfishing gear; establishing a commercial northern snakehead bowfishing license; authorizing a licensee to catch for sale northern snakeheads in the tidal waters of the State using a bow and arrow attached to a retrieval line; prohibiting a licensee from fishing under the license under specified circumstances; establishing a specified application process for the license; establishing an annual fee of $15 for the license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1054
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {630117/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {630117/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 4/01/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-221, 4-701, 4-701.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM