Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of hydraulic fracturing for any purpose; and providing that a violation is a misdemeanor and is subject to, for a first conviction, imprisonment not exceeding 5 years or a fine not exceeding $50,000, and for each subsequent conviction, imprisonment not exceeding 5 years or a fine not exceeding $100,000.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-112.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM