Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsored by
Delegate McComas
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters, including methods to adopt and implement policy addressing the prevention of child abuse that may include age-appropriate curricula for students in prekindergarten through fifth grade; requiring a report on or before December 1, 2014; providing for the termination of the Act at the end of June 30, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1186 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {242912/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments {242912/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM