Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell and Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration and the Maryland Department of the Environment jointly to study the feasibility and desirability of establishing, in whole or in part, a specified decentralized emissions inspection and testing program to implement the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program, consider matters related to emission reduction benefits under federal law, and report their findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2013.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0943
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM