Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Branch, Gutierrez, McComas, and Morhaim
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a health care provider to disclose certain medical and legal records without the authorization of an individual to a public defender who states in writing that the Office of the Public Defender represents the individual; requiring that only those records needed by the public defender to represent the individual shall be disclosed; requiring the records to be provided within 24 hours of a certain request; prohibiting a hearing officer from ordering the release of a certain individual on certain grounds; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0864
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {136380/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787077/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {136380/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {787077/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-625, 10-631, 10-632, 10-803, 4-306, 4-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page