Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report of a Low-Income Limited Liability Company
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing the filing fee that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation must collect for an annual report of a Maryland limited liability company with an annual income of less than $1,000 is $100.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report of a Low-Income Limited Liability Company
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 7:22 PM