Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Szeliga, Atterbeary, Barkley, D. Barnes, Bromwell, Carr, Carter, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Kelly, Knotts, Lam, Lisanti, Luedtke, McComas, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Rey, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Simonaire, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to encourage county boards of education to incorporate age-appropriate lessons on domestic violence into specified curriculum; altering the definition of "abuse" for purposes of specified provisions of law relating to domestic violence to include harassment and malicious destruction of property; and defining harassment and malicious destruction of property.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0960
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM