Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Charter Schools - Principals and Teachers - Resident Certification
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, Hough, Ready, and Schulz
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a public charter school to employ, without requesting specified approval, a principal who has a Resident Principal Certificate or a teacher who has a Resident Teacher Certificate; and requiring a public charter school to ensure that specified requirements for issuance of a Resident Principal Certificate or a Resident Teacher Certificate have been met.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM