Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Conaway, Lierman, Moon, Smith, and Tarlau
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Education Development Collaborative to advise and make recommendations to the State Board of Education, the General Assembly, and local school systems regarding policies necessary to promote 21st century learning that enhances socioeconomic and demographic diversity across the State and reduces the achievement gap among socioeconomic and demographics groups in the State; requiring the Collaborative to report specified information to the on or before October 1 each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0910
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {275368/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {275368/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-101 through 9.5-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM