Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Regulation of Caterers
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Corderman, Folden, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hornberger, Jackson, Jacobs, Kittleman, Korman, Krimm, Long, McKay, W. Miller, Moon, Otto, Turner, Vogt, Wivell, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Regulation of Caterers to study regulation of catering services, requirements for audits and inspections, practices in other states, national best practices related to catering services, and the impact on Maryland consumers of the regulatory structure affecting caterers; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by January 1, 2019; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0833
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on the Regulation of Caterers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Task Force on the Regulation of Caterers
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM