Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Provision of Information Relating to the Cost of Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegate Hettleman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that certain institutions of postsecondary education provide certain information to certain students on a certain form; requiring certain institutions of postsecondary education to provide certain information, including costs of attendance, financial assistance, and a student's potential total debt, to certain students under certain circumstances and in certain formats and delivered by certain methods; and requiring certain institutions to maintain certain records of certain efforts.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Provision of Information Relating to the Cost of Higher Education
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM