Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Establishment of a Sickle Cell Disease Outreach Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Nathan-Pulliam, Cullison, Donoghue, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Murphy, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, and V. Turner
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish, before June 1, 2015, a specified sickle cell disease outreach program; requiring that the program provide specified programs, support, and services; and requiring the Governor, beginning with fiscal year 2016, to include in the State budget an appropriation of at least $250,000 for the program.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM