Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Procurement by Public Institutions of Higher Education - Preference for Local Bidders or Offerors
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Anderson, Branch, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, B. Robinson, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public institutions of higher education in the City of Baltimore to give a resident bidder or offeror from the City of Baltimore a percentage preference over specified bidders or offerors in the State that are not from the City of Baltimore on the procurement of goods and services, as specified; defining specified terms; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1169
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM