Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Hornberger
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the composition, powers, and duties of the State Board of Master Electricians; changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the State Board of Electricians; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish the education requirements and qualifications for a journeyperson electrician license; requiring the Board to adopt a State electrical code; requiring a county to enforce the State electrical code or a certain local electrical code; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1368 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101 through 6-103, 6-104, 6-201 through 6-208, 6-301, 6-302, 6-303 through 6-306, 6-306.1, 6-307 through 6-320, 6-321, 6-401, 6-402, 6-404 through 6-409, 6-501 through 6-506, 6-601 through 6-603, 6-604 through 6-606, 6-701, 6-702 )
(   12-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM