Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Smoke-Free or Tobacco-Free Campuses - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, if a public institution of higher education maintains a smoke-free or tobacco-free campus, any State support from the General Fund provided to the institution shall be reduced by a percentage equal to the ratio of revenues generated by the taxes on tobacco products under Title 12 of the Tax - General Article divided by all revenues credited to the General Fund.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM