Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of Annapolis
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that Anne Arundel County may authorize the City of Annapolis to collect revenue generated in the City of Annapolis from the hotel tax; requiring the City of Annapolis to distribute and retain a specified percentage of that revenue if Anne Arundel County authorizes the City of Annapolis to collect the revenue; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {855067/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {855067/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM