Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park Land
Sponsored by
Delegates Otto and Beitzel
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State to make specified payments to counties as a payment in lieu of taxes for State forest and State park land located in the county for specified fiscal years; requiring the Governor to include specified amounts to be paid to each county in the annual budget bill; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to complete an update of a specified study and submit the study to the Governor and General Assembly on or before July 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0263
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1091 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {480214/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {480214/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-212, 5-212.1 )
(   6.5-101, 7-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM