Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB1409


CH0467

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Director of Finance for Prince George's County to distribute certain proceeds from a marriage license fee to the Community Crisis Services, Inc.; requiring certain proceeds from a marriage license fee to be used to fund battered spouse shelters and domestic violence programs if the Community Crisis Services, Inc., changes its name or objectives or ceases to exist.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Benson) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47B
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Benson) Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Returned Passed 51
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:18 PM