Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Hours of Operation on U.S. Route 50
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab and S. Howard
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Restricting the days and hours to only Monday through Friday between 6 a.m. and 9 a.m. and between 4 p.m. and 7 p.m. during which the passenger requirement applies on the portion of U.S. Route 50 designated as a high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane, between Interstate 95/Interstate 495 and U.S. Route 301; and authorizing the State Highway Administration to suspend the day and time restrictions if it determines that the restrictions do not comply with federal law.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {890315/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Hours of Operation on U.S. Route 50
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {890315/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Hours of Operation on U.S. Route 50
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM