Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education) and Delegates Kaiser, McIntosh, Jones, and Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing principles of The Blueprint for Maryland's Future that are intended to transform Maryland's early childhood, primary, and secondary education system to the levels of high-performing systems around the world; establishing a Concentration of Poverty School Grant Program; extending by 1 year, to 2021, the requirement for the State to provide a supplemental grant to eligible county boards; establishing the Teacher Collaborative Grant Program; requiring certain performance evaluations of local school systems; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1030
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301 through 1-303, 5-202, 5-203, 5-205, 5-207, 5-218, 5-403, 6-123 )
(   2016, 2017, 2018 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM