Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Report on Proposal to Authorize Counties to Elect Alternate Pension Options for Teachers
Sponsored by
Delegate Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to submit a report on or before December 31, 2013, to specified committees of the General Assembly on specified transitional statutory provisions that may be necessary if legislation were enacted to authorize a governing body of a county to elect to alter, prospectively, the form of pension benefits of specified county board employees; requiring the report to include specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM