Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Carr, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Luedtke, Ivey, Cardin, and Mizeur
Status
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide that a county charter may provide for the filling of a vacancy in the office of chief executive officer or county executive of a county by special election; submitting an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; authorizing a special election to fill a vacancy in the office of chief executive officer or county executive of a charter county to be conducted by mail; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1017
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {505469/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-21)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204630/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {505469/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (115-21) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {204630/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-303, 8-401, 9-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM