Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a person, whose business or property has been injured or threatened with injury by a violation of specified provisions of law, may maintain an action for damages, an injunction, or both, against any person who has committed the violation, regardless of whether the person maintaining the action dealt directly or indirectly with the person who has committed the violation; altering a specified defense that a defendant may raise in specified actions for damages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0858
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-48)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (88-48) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM