Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education) and Delegates Kaiser, McIntosh, Jones, A. Washington, Luedtke, and Lierman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain entities, to establish an outreach program and a certain digital recruitment platform to make use of certain media and online resources to implement a marketing campaign to encourage certain individuals to pursue a Maryland professional teacher's certificate; establishing the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Fund to assist in providing adequate funding for early childhood, primary, and secondary education in the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {385964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-22)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-25)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {385964/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (114-22) 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 48A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {434234/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (113-25) 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text - Chapter - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-2201, 18-2202, 18-2203, 18-2204, 18-2205 through 18-2208, 18-2209, 18-2210, 21-205, 2-306, 5-216, 5-219, 7-101.2, 7-1702, 7-1704, 7-2001 through 7-2006 )
(   2-605.1, 2-606 )
(   2016, 2017 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM