Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Programs - Licensing
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified regulations adopted by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene include a requirement that the process for approval of a license for an opioid maintenance program include an assessment of a specified catchment area, and the number of existing slots in opioid maintenance programs in a specified catchment area and the number of individuals in need of specified services in a specified catchment area; requiring the Secretary to adopt a specified regulation increasing a specified fee; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1060
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-01, 7.5-401, 7.5-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM