Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight - Local Government Use of Casino Revenue - Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight to study and make recommendations on the use of and restrictions on revenue from video lottery terminals and table games received by local governments; requiring the Committee to make recommendations regarding changes that will make the restrictions on the local governments' use of the revenue more consistent across jurisdictions and report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0808
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight - Local Government Use of Casino Revenue - Report
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM