Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Curriculum Content - Vocational Education and Training Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a specified course in the requirements for entry into vocational education and training programs to be taught beginning with the 2015-2016 school year; and requiring each county board of education to determine which high schools in the county may offer specified curriculum content beginning with the 2015-2016 school year.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM