Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to conduct outreach and education activities to increase health literacy and to educate consumers about the Exchange and insurance affordability programs; and requiring the Exchange to perform certain functions for Maryland Medical Assistance programs, as requested by the Maryland Department of Health and approved by the Board of Trustees for the Exchange, for the efficient administration of Maryland Medical Assistance programs.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
House 3/13/2019 3/14/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-101, 31-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM