Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Pena-Melnyk, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Impallaria, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Luedtke, McDonough, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Platt, Rose, Saab, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the integrated community oncology reporting program; establishing the purpose of the program; requiring the program to be administered by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Maryland Health Care Commission; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Commission, to adopt regulations to implement the program; establishing requirements for the regulations; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0739
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-302, 1-302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM