Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Barron, Morales, Carozza, Cullison, Fennell, Hill, Kelly, Lierman, McComas, A. Miller, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Simonaire, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and Gutierrez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 791
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each State employee to complete at least a cumulative 2 hours of in-person or virtual, interactive training on sexual harassment prevention within 6 months after the employee's initial appointment and every 2-year period thereafter; requiring that the training include certain information; requiring the Equal Employment Opportunity Coordinator to enforce certain requirements for certain units of the Executive Branch; authorizing the Coordinator to recommend that a performance audit or review be conducted; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 791
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {784966/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Reassigned to Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 791
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM