Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the subtraction modification under the State income tax from $5,000 to $20,000 of military retirement income received for retirees at least 65 years old on the last day of the taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM