Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Ciliberti, Afzali, Aumann, Beitzel, Corderman, Grammer, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Otto, Parrott, Rose, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, the performance or inducement or attempted performance or inducement of an abortion unless a certain determination as to the probable age of the unborn child is made by a certain physician; providing that the failure of a physician to perform certain actions is deemed "unprofessional conduct"; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations on or before January 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0547 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-217 through 20-225 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM