Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Guardianship and Adoption - Age of Consent and Revocation of Consent
Sponsored by
Delegates Ciliberti, Chang, Frush, Impallaria, Krebs, McKay, Rose, Shoemaker, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the time frame during which a person may revoke consent to a certain guardianship of a child; reducing the time frame during which a person may revoke consent to a certain guardianship of a child or adoption of a child; increasing from 10 to 14 years old the age at which a minor's consent is required for an adoption; increasing from 10 to 14 years old the age at which a minor may revoke consent to an adoption under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Guardianship and Adoption - Age of Consent and Revocation of Consent
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-321, 5-338, 5-339, 5-350, 5-3A-19, 5-3A-35, 5-3B-06, 5-3B-15, 5-3B-20, 5-3B-21 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM