Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees
Sponsored by
Delegates DeBoy, Bromwell, Clagett, Cluster, Gaines, Lafferty, McDermott, Olszewski, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring retirees of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System who are reemployed under specified circumstances to terminate participation in a Deferred Retirement Option Program and receive a specified lump sum payment before being reemployed by the Natural Resources Police Force; requiring that specified retirees of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System who are reemployed and injured under specified circumstances receive a specified adjustment to their retirement allowance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0908
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-403, 26-403.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM