Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Adams, Beitzel, Bromwell, Buckel, Cassilly, Chang, Grammer, Hayes, Holmes, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kittleman, Krebs, Mautz, McComas, McKay, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Rey, Shoemaker, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the date to October 1, 2021, for a specified preliminary plan to be approved and consequently exempted from specified provisions of the Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0748
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   9-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page