Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office of Crime Control and Prevention)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Victim Services Unit in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; transferring the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board from the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to the Victim Services Unit; transferring the program for sexual assault forensic examinations from the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to the Victim Services Unit; requiring, each year, the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report on matters related to crime victims by December 31; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {132114/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {132114/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1007, 11-1101 through 11-1105, 11-801, 11-803, 11-804, 11-805, 11-814, 11-815, 11-816.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM