Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Platt and Buckel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission, on or before December 31, 2017, to license 25 medical cannabis growers; requiring the Commission to actively seek to achieve geographic diversity when licensing medical cannabis growers, while giving additional weight and consideration to specified applicants; requiring the Commission to actively seek applicants for a medical cannabis grower license that incorporate elements of a specified research program in their applications; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0788
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM