Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Pharmacogenomics
Sponsored by
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force on Pharmacogenomics; providing for the membership, chair, staffing, and duties of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to provide a specified report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2014; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/19/2013 Text - First - Task Force on Pharmacogenomics
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM