Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Towne Centre at Laurel PG 320-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing Laurel Commons from a specified list of areas in Prince George's County that are underserved by restaurants; and authorizing the Prince George's County Board of License Commissioners to issue up to six Class B-DD (Development District) licenses to restaurants located within the Towne Centre at Laurel.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (123-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Second Reading Passed 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM