Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation and the Maryland Transit Administration to study the feasibility of using the navigable waters of the Chesapeake Bay as a water transportation network to link waterfront communities along the Chesapeake Bay; requiring the Department and the Administration to prepare an inventory of certain facilities on the Chesapeake Bay and to estimate the cost of implementing a certain network; requiring a certain report be made to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30, 2022; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0907 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:34 PM