Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Safety - Gas Piping Systems - Bonding Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a person installing yellow corrugated stainless steel tubing as part of a gas piping system to bond the system to a specified electrode system at a specified location; prohibiting a person from using a specified bonding wire that is smaller than a specified size; and establishing a specified penalty for a violation of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM